Practice the questions of **McGraw Hill Math Grade 4 Answer Key PDF** **Chapter 5 Test** to secure good marks & knowledge in the exams.

## McGraw-Hill Math Grade 4 Chapter 5 Test Answer Key

**Find each product using partial products. You can draw pictures for each problem on another sheet of paper.**

Question 1.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 16 and 4 is 64

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 2.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 58 and 6 is 348

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 3.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 97 and 8 is 776

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 4.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 18 and 3 is 54

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 5.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 63 and 5 is 315

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 6.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 55 and 9 is 495

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Find each product.

Question 7.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 266 and 6 is 1596

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 8.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 793 and 5 is 3965

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 9.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 625 and 8 is 5000

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 10.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 4905 and 4 is 19620

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 11.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 7990 and 8 is 63920

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 12.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 5914 and 3 is 17742

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 13.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 532 and 6 is 3192

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 14.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 1715 and 8 is 13720

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 15.

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 9023 and 4 is 36092

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

**Find each product. You can draw arrays for each problem on another sheet of paper.**

Question 16.

42 × 25 = ____

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 42 x 25 = 1050

take the carried value and place it in the column to the left.

So if you were multiplying numbers in the tens column and you needed to carry a number,

you would place that “number” in the hundreds column.

Question 17.

13 × 29 = ___

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 13 and 29 is 377

Question 18.

71 × 33 = ___

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 71 and 33 is 2343

Question 19.

17 × 31 = ___

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 17 and 31 is 527

Question 20.

24 × 53 = ___

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 24 and 53 is 1272

Question 21.

49 × 14 = ___

Answer:

Explanation:

The product of 49 and 14 is 686

**Find each product using mental math.**

Question 22.

400 × 50 = ___

Answer:

20,000

Explanation:

4 x 5 = 20

Adding the remaining zeros

Question 23.

30 × 600 = ___

Answer:

18,000

Explanation:

3 x 6 = 18

Adding the remaining zeros

Question 24.

70 × 400 = ____

Answer:

28,000

Explanation:

7 x 4 = 28

Adding the remaining zeros

**Use rounding or compatible numbers to estimate each product.**

Question 25.

52 × 61 = ___

Answer:

3000

Explanation:

52 is rounded to 50

and 61 is rounded to 60

5 x 6 = 30

adding the remaining zeros

Question 26.

47 × 11 = ___

Answer:

500

Explanation:

47 is rounded to 50

11 is rounded to 10

5 x 1 = 5

adding the remaining zeros.

Question 27.

897 × 9 = ___

Answer:

8100

Explanation:

897 is rounded to 900

9 x 9 = 81

adding the remaining zeros

**Solve. Make an estimate to show that each answer is reasonable.**

Question 28.

A hotel has 239 beds. There are 4 blankets for each bed. How many blankets does the hotel have?

_____________________

The hotel staff washes the blankets. So far, they have washed 402 blankets. How many blankets are left to wash?

_____________________

Answer:

956 blankets in total

554 blankets are left to wash

Explanation:

hotel has 239 beds.

and 4 blankets for each bed.

239 x 4 = 956 blankets

they have washed 402 blankets.

956 – 402 = 554

so, 554 blankets are left to wash

Question 29.

A used car lot has 16 rows of cars to sell. There are 12 cars in each row. How many cars are for sale in the used car lot?

Answer:

Explanation:

16 rows of cars to sell.

There are 12 cars in each row.

16 x 12 = 192

192 cars are for sale in the used car lot

Question 30.

Marco has 31 green marbles, 19 red marbles, and 22 blue marbles. How many marbles does he have in all?

_________________

Nicole has 209 marbles. How many more marbles does Nicole have than Marco?

_________________

Answer:

Marco has 72 marbles

137 more marbles that Nicole have than Marco

Explanation:

31 green marbles, 19 red marbles, and 22 blue marbles.

31 + 19 + 22 = 72 marbles

Nicole has 209 marbles.

209 – 72 = 137

Question 31.

One city has a population of 174,533. A nearby city has 129,054 people. How many people live in the two communities.

Answer:

Explanation:

Let us round 174,533 to 150,000

and 129054 to 150,000

by adding 150,000 + 150,000 = 300,000

in both the communities